ANN NORTHALL

Charity number: 237353-3
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 5 NOVEMBER 1918 AND 14 JULY 1939
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT EITHER OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF NEW BRENTFORD GENERALLY OR OF SUCH DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS RESIDENT THEREIN AS THE TRUSTEES SELECT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NEW BRENTFORD
Registration history
  • 27 October 1964: Standard registration
  • 09 March 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 08 June 2012: Re-registered
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of