Financial history THE FEDERATION OF BRITISH ARTISTS

Charity number: 200048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.62m £1.82m £1.65m £1.13m £1.38m
Total expenditure £1.53m £1.84m £1.68m £1.47m £1.47m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £126.04k
Income - Donations and legacies £49.91k £53.53k £10.35k £9.69k £4.61k
Income - Other trading activities £6.00k £90.70k £28.20k £15.20k £5.00k
Income - Charitable activities £1.43m £1.49m £1.46m £855.10k £1.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.21k £1.67k £1.97k £1.07k £41
Income - Other £141.12k £181.58k £157.17k £245.21k £152.46k
Income - Legacies £17.29k £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.52m £1.83m £1.68m £1.46m £1.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.00k £5.43k £3.53k £4.66k £4.82k
Expenditure - Governance £36.44k £52.39k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0