Trustees THE FEDERATION OF BRITISH ARTISTS

Charity number: 200048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN GLASSPOOL Chair 25 May 2017
None on record
Maxine Lesley Angus Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Carolyn Frances Simpson Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
MICHAEL FRANCIS DAVIES Trustee 12 October 2021
ROYAL SOCIETY OF BRITISH ARTISTS LIMITED
Received: On time
Martin Philip Howarth Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Richard Timothy Rees Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Tessa Louise Coleman Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Nicholas David Glazebrook Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Linda Mairi Alexander Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Robin Hazlewood Trustee 07 November 2019
ROYAL INSTITUTE OF PAINTERS IN WATER COLOURS
Received: On time
THE ALDGATE AND ALLHALLOWS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Eela Devani Trustee 07 November 2019
INDEPENDENT PUBLISHERS GUILD
Recently registered
Alastair Adams Trustee 25 July 2019
None on record
Jonathan French Trustee 25 May 2017
None on record