FRIENDS OF THE HURTWOOD

Charity number: 200053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 11 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 11 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 21 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 19 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 11 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 11 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 31 May 2017 On time Download