Accounts and annual returns SHUTTLEWORTH CHARITY FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 200144
Charity reporting is overdue by 986 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 256 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 256 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 621 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 621 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 986 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 986 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required