Financial history SHUTTLEWORTH CHARITY FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 200144
Charity reporting is overdue by 998 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1 £1 £1 £1 £1
Total expenditure £15 £15 £15 £20 £25
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A