Financial history EVERTON-CUM-TETWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 200201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £4.37k £5.35k £6.56k £13.64k £23.31k
Total expenditure £2.86k £4.68k £3.86k £8.46k £3.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £11.79k £18.24k