Financial history THE HOOVER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 200274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £72.80k £85.08k £83.44k £164.84k £90.68k
Total expenditure £201.09k £198.64k £18.16k £24.75k £15.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A