WILLIAM CHARLES LEE SICK POOR FUND

Charity number: 200301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £458 £494 £505 £515 £525
Total expenditure £560 £560 £640 £640 £640
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A