CROWHURST RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES

Charity number: 200315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required