OLD GRESHAMIAN LODGE NO 5769 CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 200369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.68k £6.82k £1.90k £2.68k £1.19k
Total expenditure £1.68k £6.82k £1.90k £2.68k £1.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A