'LEST WE FORGET' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 200390
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS AMENDED 1958 18 JUNE 1975, 7 JUNE 1987, 7 JUNE 1998 AND 6 JUNE 1999.
Charitable objects
(A) TO KEEP ALIVE AN ERNEST ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE WELFARE AND HAPPINESS OF DISABLED MEN AND WOMEN IN OR OUT OF HOSPITALS AND HOMES WHO HAVE OR WHO ARE SERVING IN THE ARMED FORCES. (B) TO ORGANISE AND ENCOURAGE PERSONAL SERVICE AND VOLUNTARY WORK IN CONNECTION WITH ENTERTAINING AND EXTENDING HOSPITALITY TO SUCH MEMBERS AND EX-MEMBERS OF HER MAJESTY'S FORCES (C) TO CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN SYMPATHY WITH THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE GENERAL COUNCIL THINKS FIT (D) TO RECEIVE MONIES BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTIONS, DONATIONS, ENDOWMENTS, FEES AND GIFTS IN KIND, AND TO RAISE FUNDS FOR THE PURPOSE OF CARRYING ON THE WORK OF THE ASSOCIATION AND TO ADMINISTER SUCH FUNDS IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE AUTHORISED BY THE GENERAL COUNCIL IN REGULAR ASSEMBLY; (E) TO PROMOTE THE FORMATION OF BRANCHES OF THE ASSOCIATION AND TO ENCOURAGE THE INTEREST AND WORK OF SUCH BRANCHES THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE COMMONWEALTH.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 20 February 1963 : registered
  • 06 July 2015 : removed (TRANSFER OF FUNDS)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Disability
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helped
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources