Financial history ARUNDEL HOUSE (HAMILTON FELLOWS)

Charity number: 200497
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.21k £1.39k £3.06k £1.84k £1.64k
Total expenditure £7.16k £6.60k £10.45k £4.19k £2.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A