KING'S MEDICAL RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 200539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £273.27k £80.91k £114.45k £70.24k £53.59k
Total expenditure £242.48k £557.74k £283.45k £347.28k £335.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A