HARMAN ATWOOD FOR ALMSHOUSES AND CURATES HOUSE

Charity number: 200553
Charity reporting is overdue by 1498 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 37 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 37 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 402 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 402 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 768 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 768 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1133 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1133 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1498 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1498 days