PARTIS COLLEGE

Charity number: 200606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £291.57k £255.97k £287.42k £247.00k £264.69k
Total expenditure £208.32k £250.74k £313.53k £278.72k £279.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A