F A PANETH METEORITE COLLECTION

Charity number: 200665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.38k £10.30k £10.76k £11.67k £8.44k
Total expenditure £9.98k £9.10k £9.49k £10.57k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A