GORDON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 200668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 18 February 2021 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 18 February 2021 294 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 12 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 12 February 2017 On time Download