THE ROTARY HOLIDAYS FOR CHILDREN TRUST

Charity number: 200722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.98k £10.85k £10.22k £11.07k £11.32k
Total expenditure £12.78k £11.65k £9.24k £10.46k £11.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A