Financial history THE UNITED CHARITIES OF ST MARTIN

Charity number: 200733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.08k £6.35k £6.34k £5.98k £9.73k
Total expenditure £4.88k £8.24k £5.36k £6.09k £8.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A