TAVISTOCK, WHITCHURCH AND DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION TRUST FUND

Charity number: 200782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.72k £2.39k £2.40k £2.53k £2.58k
Total expenditure £2.76k £1.63k £1.45k £1.97k £1.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A