PAYHEMBURY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 200912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.74k £1.01k £895 £892 £877
Total expenditure £910 £1.10k £1.15k £800 £1.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A