LITCHBOROUGH PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 201062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £7.33k £7.84k £8.42k £9.74k £10.41k
Total expenditure £6.80k £7.45k £7.75k £9.54k £10.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A