Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S HOSPITAL, CHERTSEY

Charity number: 201105
Charity reporting is overdue by 120 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £12.60k £17.42k £28.70k £16.58k £6.16k
Total expenditure £42.63k £84.47k £52.03k £58.65k £17.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A