Accounts and annual returns WM SHEPPARD CHARITY

Charity number: 201198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 03 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 19 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required