THE FRIENDS OF THE HOSPITALS OF LUTON AND DUNSTABLE

Charity number: 201201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required