THE FRIENDS OF THE HOSPITALS OF LUTON AND DUNSTABLE

Charity number: 201201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £15.16k £128.04k £22.20k £12.42k £8.63k
Total expenditure £26.99k £76.08k £67.49k £33.28k £619
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A