Accounts and annual returns DEVON QUEEN VICTORIA COMMEMORATION AND KING EDWARD VII MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 201276
Charity reporting is overdue by 1595 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 134 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 134 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 499 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 499 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 864 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 864 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1229 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1229 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1595 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1595 days