Financial history DEVON QUEEN VICTORIA COMMEMORATION AND KING EDWARD VII MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 201276
Charity reporting is overdue by 1599 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £4.98k £4.97k £5.01k £5.00k £4.90k
Total expenditure £3.36k £4.49k £4.19k £5.48k £5.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A