Financial history ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - HANTS AND SURREY BORDER BRANCH

Charity number: 201291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £279.66k £235.45k £277.47k £197.88k £231.00k
Total expenditure £286.21k £121.95k £220.07k £192.41k £185.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £38.26k £34.21k