Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ALTON HOSPITALS

Charity number: 201424
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.50k £1.84k £5.92k £7.68k £852
Total expenditure £867 £1.76k £2.51k £4.96k £1.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A