Accounts and annual returns JOHN WARREN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 201522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 February 2021 300 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 24 February 2021 300 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 05 August 2019 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required