Accounts and annual returns SIR WILLIAM MATTHEWS PENSION FUND

Charity number: 201663
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required