PARSON DROVE UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 201667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £10.56k £13.08k £11.60k £12.03k £13.15k
Total expenditure £8.97k £11.03k £8.83k £10.25k £21.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A