ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 201885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.24k £3.49k £3.49k £3.64k £3.71k
Total expenditure £3.84k £3.70k £3.70k £2.82k £2.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A