Trustees OTTERY FEOFFEE CHARITY
Charity number: 202095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANE VERONICA PASSEY | Chair |
|
||||||||
Peter Hamilton Faithfull | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ian James Holmes | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Glyn Dobson | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Cammack | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Paul Bartlet | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
WENDY CAMMACK | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MARK JAMES GALPIN ESSAME | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS JUDITH DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Sir John Michael Kennaway | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS JUNE GLENNIE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.