SALISBURY CITY ALMSHOUSE AND WELFARE CHARITIES

Charity number: 202110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN CORKILL Trustee 03 May 2019
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
THE ROTARY CLUB OF SALISBURY CHARITABLE FUND Received: On time
FIONA GREEN Trustee 02 December 2016
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
Dr ROBERT HEWETSON Trustee 03 April 2020
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
FRIENDS OF SALISBURY MEDICAL PRACTICE Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
PETER WILLIAM KENNETH MOSS Trustee 02 September 2016
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
ALISON ROSER HATTON Trustee 01 July 2016
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
PATRICIA MARGARET LUSH Trustee 07 November 2008
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
ANNA ELIZABETH TAYLOR Trustee 03 February 2017
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
RODNEY WALTER SHIPSEY Trustee 03 May 2019
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
TREVOR AUSTRENG Trustee 06 September 2018
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
ALASTAIR JAMES LANGTON BRAIN Trustee 05 February 2016
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
Dr HELENA EWING Trustee 01 May 2020
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
Thomas Frederick Clay Trustee 05 May 2017
SALISBURY CITY EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY Received: On time
WILTSHIRE CREATIVE Received: On time