Governing document BLANCHMINSTER TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16TH MARCH 1982 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 27TH JUNE 1988, SCHEME OF 12TH AUGUST 1991 AND SCHEME OF 7 AUGUST 1996, AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 4 JULY 1997.
Charitable objects
(1) FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OF DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS (2) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION (FOR FURTHER DETAILS, PLEASE SEE CLAUSES 29 TO 32 OF THE 1982 SCHEME)
Area of benefit
BUDE-STRATTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.