W H BLANDY TRUST

Charity number: 202154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.78k £4.73k £4.91k £5.32k £4.50k
Total expenditure £2.53k £1.56k £3.42k £2.80k £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A