CHURCH LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 202194
Charity reporting is overdue by 1123 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2016
Total gross income £1 £1 £0 £2 £0
Total expenditure £1 £1 £0 £2 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0