MANATON CHURCH FIELD

Charity number: 202360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.63k £8.39k £2.31k £2.64k £2.64k
Total expenditure £759 £12.21k £0 £1.48k £1.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A