Accounts and annual returns ELDER STUBBS CHARITY

Charity number: 202497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 April 2020 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 April 2020 180 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window