SIR JOHN COTTON (OR THE FLITWICK CHARITY)

Charity number: 202556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 November 2020 385 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 November 2020 385 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 November 2020 749 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 November 2020 749 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 November 2020 1114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 November 2020 1114 days late Download