THE HUNTINGDONSHIRE SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 202573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 08 November 2016 On time Download