THE HUNTINGDONSHIRE SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 202573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS A M WHITE-HORAN Trustee None on record
Moira Penney Trustee 10 September 2019 None on record
FRANCIS CRAIG NEWTON Trustee None on record
Judy King Trustee 10 September 2019 None on record
Nicholas Ruston Trustee 09 February 2016 None on record
Brian Worthington Trustee 24 February 2014 None on record
Darren Fletcher Trustee 04 September 2013 None on record
Christopher Mosley Trustee 21 February 2014 None on record
THE VEN HUGH MCCURDY Trustee 21 December 2012
CHARITY FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (HUNTS CLERGY CHARITY) Received: On time
CAMBRIDGESHIRE ACRE Received: On time
Peter Leonard Ernest Bucknell Chair None on record