Financial history AGE CONCERN, EASTLEIGH TOWN

Charity number: 202718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £22.44k £28.45k £40.36k £33.20k £28.29k
Total expenditure £24.87k £25.77k £48.39k £30.68k £23.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.66k £2.71k