Accounts and annual returns SWINDON BLIND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 203090
Charity reporting is overdue by 537 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 172 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 172 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 537 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 537 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required