PURTON INSTITUTE AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 203202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time Download