Accounts and annual returns JOHN BECK'S AND LEWIS FETTO'S CHARITY

Charity number: 203344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required