Accounts and annual returns WOTTON UNDER EDGE UNITED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 203467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required